Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098005

EP1098005 - Pressure cycling reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pressure Biosciences, Inc.
14 Norfolk Avenue
South Easton, MA 02375 / US
[2011/19]
Former [2010/24]For all designated states
Pressure Biosciences Inc.
14 Norfolk Avenue
South Easton, MA 02375 / US
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
B.B.I. Bioseq, Inc.
375 West Street
West Bridgewater, MA 02379 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Laugharn, James A., Jr.
16 Robinson Park
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
02 / Dreier, Gustav H.
189 Moxley Street
Jefferson, NY 12093 / US
03 / Rudd, Edwin A.
52 Brookdale Road
Salem, NH 03079 / US
04 / Green, David J.
19 Webber Lane
Fitzwilliam, NH 03447 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Vossius, Volker , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2001/19]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00127181.607.03.1996
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateUS1995039960607.03.1995         Original published format: US 399606
US1995047230407.06.1995         Original published format: US 472304
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1098005
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1098005
Date:13.03.2002
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098005
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/04, C12M1/40, C07H21/00
[2002/10]
Former International [2001/19]C12Q1/68, C07K1/04, C12M1/40, C07H21/00, B01J3/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Druckwechselreaktor[2001/19]
English:Pressure cycling reactor[2001/19]
French:Reacteur à cycle de pression[2001/19]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
28.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2010Fee for grant paid
23.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96909622.1  / EP0814900
Opposition(s)14.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.06.2010Request for further processing filed
23.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 15
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.05.2011
[2012/23]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4070008  (SCHLIECKMANN ALFRED) [X] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9428745  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) [X] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4412552  (KOLBANOVSKY JULY A [SU], et al) [X] 1-29 * column W *;
 [X]EP0602363  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [X] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9303135  (BIOTEC RESEARCH & DEV INC [US]) [X] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]  ALEJANDRO A. PALADINI, JR. & GREGORIO WEBER, "Pressure-Induced Reversible Dissociation of Enolase", BIOCHEMISTRY, EASTON, PA., US, (1981), vol. 20, no. 9, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 2587 - 2593, XP002187200 [X] 1-29 * page 2590; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00512a034