EP1088845 - Ester-amide block copolymers and process for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [2005/07] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kasei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Yuji 7-6-203, Doi 1-chome Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi 746-001 / JP | 02 /
Yamakawa, Hiroshi 1-5-201, Shibata 2-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | 03 /
Kirikihira, Isamu 8-20, Betsumei 6-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | 04 /
Shimosato, Shinji 7, Aza-okada, Oaza-kamajima, Yotomi-cho Ama-gun, Aichi, 498 / JP | [2001/32] |
Former [2001/14] | 01 /
Kubo, Yuji 129, Hazuotsu Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamakawa, Hiroshi 1-5-201, Shibata 2-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | |||
03 /
Kirikihira, Isamu 8-20, Betsumei 6-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie, 510 / JP | |||
04 /
Shimosato, Shinji 7, Aza-okada, Oaza-kamajima, Yotomi-cho Ama-gun, Aichi, 498 / JP | Representative(s) | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/14] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00127784.7 | 15.11.1995 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19940281843 | 16.11.1994 Original published format: JP 28184394 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088845 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088845 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088845 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/44, C08G77/455 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C08G69/04 (EP,US);
C08G69/42 (EP,US);
C08G69/44 (EP,US);
C08G77/455 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/14] | C08G69/44 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/14] | Title | German: | Esteramidblockcopolymere und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/14] | English: | Ester-amide block copolymers and process for producing same | [2001/14] | French: | Copolymères en bloc d'ester amide et procédé pour sa préparation | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 10.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95308169.2 / EP0712879 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 18.05.2005 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61293224 ; | [A]GB2169912 (DAICEL CHEM) [A] 1,6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0377447 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1,6 * claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870526), vol. 011, no. 163, Database accession no. (C - 424), & JP61293224 A 19861224 (TOKYO INST OF TECHNOL) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |