Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1111858

EP1111858 - A weighted round robin scheduling engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel USA Sourcing, L.P.
1000 Coit Road
Plano, TX 75075 / US
[2001/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, James W.
6046 Hyland Way
Penngrove, California 94951 / US
02 / Nelson, Michael
7463 Monique Place
Rohnert Park, California 94928 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Werner Karl
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/26]Schmidt, Werner Karl
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2001/26]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00127943.921.12.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateUS1999046958322.12.1999         Original published format: US 469583
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1111858
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1111858
Date:07.07.2004
[2004/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1111858
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[2001/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/26]
TitleGerman:Maschine zur gewogener kreisförmigen Ablaufsteuerung[2001/26]
English:A weighted round robin scheduling engine[2001/26]
French:Engin de planification circulaire pondérée[2001/26]
Examination procedure07.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/10]
18.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2007Fee for grant paid
27.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
TR10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
LU21.12.2007
IT31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/42]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
TR10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
LU21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/37]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
LU21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/33]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/13]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/48]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
IE21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/40]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/33]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0798897  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9714240  (NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [A] 2 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9926382  (CABLETRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0886405  (NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SHIMONISHI H ET AL, "An improvement of weighted round robin cell scheduling in ATM networks", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1997. GLOBECOM '97., IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 3-8 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4198-8, pages 1119 - 1123, XP010254729 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1119, column R, lines 3-14 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1997.638500