Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1113690

EP1113690 - Communication apparatus and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
[2006/13]
Former [2001/27]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tada, Masahiro, c/o K. K. Toshiba
Intellectual Property Division, 1-1 Shibaura
1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2001/27]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00128628.528.12.2000
[2001/27]
Priority number, dateJP1999037307328.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37307399
[2001/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1113690
Date:04.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1113690
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1113690
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2001/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2001/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationseinrichtung und übereinstimmendes Steuerungsverfahren[2001/27]
English:Communication apparatus and control method therefor[2001/27]
French:Appareil de communication et procédé pour la gérer[2001/27]
Examination procedure28.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/27]
15.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2006Fee for grant paid
25.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5301225  (SUZUKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7,9,11,13,15 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 30 *;
 [Y]WO9922352  (ROCKWELL SEMICONDUCTOR SYS INC [US]) [Y] 1,11 * page 6, line 30 - line 32 * * page 7, line 21 - line 31 * * page 19, line 16 - line 20 * * page 19, line 34 - line 36 *;
 [Y]GB2328588  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7,9,13,15 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 29 * * page 4, line 1 - line 14 *;
 [A]WO9827769  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 10, line 25 - line 30 *;
 [A]US5627882  (CHIEN CHENG-TUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 70 - column 5, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0711089  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 30 - line 41 *