Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021003

EP1021003 - Wireless Network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/47]
Former [2009/03]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/40]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/29]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Herrmann, Christoph, Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
02 / Du, Yonggang, Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date00200074.311.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199910162218.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901622
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021003
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1021003
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021003
Date:14.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04B1/707
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Drahtloses Netzwerk[2000/29]
English:Wireless Network[2000/29]
French:Réseau sans fil[2000/29]
Examination procedure02.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
03.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2008Fee for grant paid
01.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9818280  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 21 * * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 14 * * figures 1,3-7; claims 5-7 *;
 [X]  M. MOULY, M.-B. PAUTET, The GSM System for Mobile Communications, PALAISEAU, CELL&SYS. CORRESPONDENCE, XP002256167 [X] 1-4 * page 206, paragraph 1 - page 215, paragraph 1 * * page 245, paragraph 1 - page 245, paragraph L * * page 256, paragraph 2 - page 258, paragraph L * * page 368, paragraph L - page 376, paragraph L *
 [A]  A. BÖTTCHER, Vielfachzugriffsmethoden in zentralisierten Datenfunknetzen für zeitvariante, gestörte Kanäle, DÜSSELDORF, VDI-VERLAG GMBH, XP002256168 [A] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph L * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph L * * figures 1.1,2.4,2.5 *