blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990387 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990387



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 518
11.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.04.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
02.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 13
15.02.2008 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
08.01.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.12.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.11.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.11.2007 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
19.11.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.11.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.11.2007 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
12.11.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 6
08.11.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.03.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.02.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.02.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.02.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
20.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.01.2006 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
20.12.2005 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
13.10.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
05.10.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
03.10.2005 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.08.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.07.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.07.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.07.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.07.2005 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
18.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
02.06.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
02.06.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.03.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
29.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.09.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.09.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.09.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.09.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.09.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.09.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.07.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.07.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.01.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
22.01.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.12.2003 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
05.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.08.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.08.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.08.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.07.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
04.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
04.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
02.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 37
02.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
23.06.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.06.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
12.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 16
12.07.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 16
12.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.04.2002 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
19.04.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.04.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
08.01.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.09.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.08.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.08.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.08.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 19
07.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 18
02.02.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Description Search / examination 10
18.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6