blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990387


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
11.04.2008 Revocation of patent published on  14.05.2008  [2008/20]
19.03.2008 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
14.02.2008 Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2007 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
09.11.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2006 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  01.03.2006  [2006/09]
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
05.10.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
26.07.2005 Change: Appeal number
07.07.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
31.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
17.09.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.07.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2004 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.12.2003 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
21.11.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
05.08.2003 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
11.07.2003 Opposition filed published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
09.07.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
20.06.2003 Opposition filed published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
19.06.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
16.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]
09.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
17.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.03.2002 Renewal fee
22.02.2002 First examination report
19.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
20.04.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  06.06.2001 [2001/23]
01.02.2001 Renewal fee
19.01.2001 Request for examination filed published on  07.03.2001 [2001/10]
04.08.2000 Publication of search report published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
11.02.2000 Change - extension states
01.02.2000 Renewal fee