blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990387 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00200172 EP96200336



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0990387Global Dossier 02.10.2002B1
EP0990387 20.09.2000A3
EP0990387 05.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
EP96200336 13.02.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL9500276 02.09.1996A
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL9500277 02.09.1996A
Priority number Date
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0728411Global Dossier 26.07.2000B1
EP0728411 23.10.1996A3
EP0728411 28.08.1996A2
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69609433D 31.08.2000D1
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69609433T 08.03.2001T2
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69624152D 07.11.2002D1
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69624152T 06.11.2003T2
Priority number Date
NL9500276 15.02.1995
NL9500277 15.02.1995
TypeType Earlier application
 EP0728411