blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0990387

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted02.10.2002
Opposition procedure07.02.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 14.05.2008 
Appeal following opposition04.07.2005APPEAL FILED
03.10.2005APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
07.02.2008APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:728411
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:07.03.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010108
 
Event date:06.06.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:10.04.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020222
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:728411
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:07.11.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69624152
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021107
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:25.04.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
Effective DATE:20030612
 
Event date:27.08.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
Effective DATE:20030612
 
Event date:27.08.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
Effective DATE:20030702
 
Event date:01.10.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
 
Event date:03.11.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
 
Event date:03.11.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
 
Event date:01.03.2006 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
Effective DATE:20030612
 
Event date:01.03.2006 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
Effective DATE:20030702
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
 
Event date:30.03.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20070330
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
Effective DATE:20030612
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
Effective DATE:20030702
 
Event date:03.03.2008 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DELAVAL INTERNATIONAL AB
 
Event date:03.03.2008 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROLION B.V
 
Event date:14.05.2008 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20080207
 
Event date:14.05.2008 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Effective DATE:20080207
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20080227
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20080224
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20080227
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:01.07.2008 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20080207
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080218
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:19.08.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE ECNC
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM THE REGISTER