Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990387

EP0990387 - An implement for milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.04.2008
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Van den Berg, Karel
Boterbloemstraat 5
2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M.
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M.
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date00200172.513.02.1996
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateNL1995000027615.02.1995         Original published format: NL 9500276
NL1995000027715.02.1995         Original published format: NL 9500277
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990387
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990387
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990387
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/02, A01J5/017
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Melken von Tieren[2000/14]
English:An implement for milking animals[2000/14]
French:Dispositif pour la traite d'animaux[2000/14]
Examination procedure08.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
22.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2002Fee for grant paid
12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96200336.4  / EP0728411
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Karsten
ZACCO GmbH
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 02  02.07.2003  04.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V
Kromme Spieringweg 248 b
2141 AA Vijhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
Indeig B.V.
P.O. Box 3
2050 AA Overveen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Karsten
Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 02  02.07.2003  04.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V
Kromme Spieringweg 248 b
2141 AA Vijhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
Indeig B.V. P.O. Box 3
NL-2050 AA Overveen / NL
Former [2007/52]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Karsten
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 02  02.07.2003  04.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V
Kromme Spieringweg 248 b
2141 AA Vijhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
Indeig B.V. P.O. Box 3
NL-2050 AA Overveen / NL
Former [2006/09]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Amery, Marcus James
Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 02  02.07.2003  04.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V
Kromme Spieringweg 248 b
2141 AA Vijhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
Indeig B.V. P.O. Box 3
NL-2050 AA Overveen / NL
Former [2003/35]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
 02  02.07.2003   
Prolion B.V
Kromme Spieringweg 248 b
2141 AA Vijhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
Indeig B.V. P.O. Box 3
NL-2050 AA Overveen / NL
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  26.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
07.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.06.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.02.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/20]
Appeal following opposition04.07.2005Appeal received No.  T0915/05
03.10.2005Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
07.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
15.02.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2004/02]
Former [2003/45]DE03.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9306716  (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]AU564242B  (NU PULSE NEW ZEALAND LTD) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantWO9306716
 EP0385539