Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022220

EP1022220 - Device for filling boxes with filled bags [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2001 [2001/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Case Packing Sales Europe B.V.
Industrieweg 24
6039 AP Stramproy / NL
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Aquarius, Pieter Theodorus Joseph
Industrieweg 24
6039 AP Stamproy / NL
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Ferguson, Alexander
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V.
P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Ferguson, Alexander
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00200232.721.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateNL1999101111322.01.1999         Original published format: NL 1011113
[2000/30]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022220
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65B5/08, B65B39/12
[2000/30]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/15]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Füllen von Kartons mit gefüllten Beuteln[2000/30]
English:Device for filling boxes with filled bags[2000/30]
French:Appareil pour remplir des boîtes avec des sachets remplis[2000/30]
Examination procedure27.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/48]
11.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/48]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4007575  (HARTMAN CARL C) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 60 - column 8, line 2 * * column 18, line 17 - column 19, line 24; figures 1,10 * [Y] 5-7,9,13-15;
 [X]EP0062249  (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10,11 * page 6, line 25 - page 10, line 4; figure - *;
 [X]US5542238  (JOHNSON DARRELL B [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 63; figure - *;
 [X]EP0331210  (OSTMA MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 33; figure - *;
 [YA]EP0614834  (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO [JP]) [Y] 5-7,9,14,15 * figure -; claim - * [A] 10,11;
 [Y]FR2075013  (HAMAC HANSELLA GMBH) [Y] 13 * page 5, line 18 - line 26; figure - *;
 [A]US2956382  (WARDELL VERRIS C)