EP1031797 - An arrangement for mounting a radiator on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigarth AB Box 45 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2000/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hageberg, Thorleif Brogatan 12 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 00200386.1 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | SE19990000721 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: SE 9900721 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031797 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031797 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031797 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/02 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
F24D19/0246 (EP);
F24D19/02 (EP);
F24D19/0213 (EP);
F24D19/0256 (EP);
F24D19/0283 (EP);
F24D19/0286 (EP);
F24D2220/2054 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | Befestigungseinrichtung eines Heizkörpers an einer Oberfläche | [2000/35] | English: | An arrangement for mounting a radiator on a substrate | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un radiateur sur une surface | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.12.2005 | BE | 21.12.2005 | CH | 21.12.2005 | CY | 21.12.2005 | FI | 21.12.2005 | FR | 21.12.2005 | IT | 21.12.2005 | LI | 21.12.2005 | NL | 21.12.2005 | IE | 07.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | DK | 21.03.2006 | GB | 21.03.2006 | GR | 21.03.2006 | SE | 21.03.2006 | ES | 01.04.2006 | PT | 22.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
FR | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GB | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2006 | ||
FR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GB | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GB | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GB | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 21.12.2005 | |
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2839355 (GOTTBEHUET HANS GERD GMBH) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9404875 (SIGARTH IND AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0681149 (MB SRL [IT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4440746 (MAYCO BEFESTIGUNGSTECHNIK UND [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,13 * columns 4-5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0723118 (SIGARTH IND AB [SE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29609438U (GOTTBEHUET HANS GERD [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0723118 |