Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033619

EP1033619 - Photographic film element containing an emulsion with broadened green responsivity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Buitano, Lois A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Link, Steven G., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Sowinski, Allan F., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/36]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive
Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date00200539.517.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999025998801.03.1999         Original published format: US 259988
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033619
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033619
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033619
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/30, G03C1/16, G03C1/18
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/36]G03C7/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/11]
Former [2002/04]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Photographischer Film enthaltend eine Emulsion mit verbreiteter Grünempfindlichkeit[2000/36]
English:Photographic film element containing an emulsion with broadened green responsivity[2000/36]
French:Pellicule photographique comprenant une émulsion ayant une sensibilité accrue pour le vert[2000/36]
Examination procedure21.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2004Fee for grant paid
14.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE08.07.2004
[2005/14]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0409019  (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [X] 1-30 * see claims 1-3 and page 2, lines 1-10; claims 5-6 and page 4, lines 32-37; Figures 3A and 4; examples *;
 [X]US5037728  (SHIBA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-30 * see claim 1 and Figures 4-6 and 8-9 *;
 [X]EP0747759  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-30 * see Figures 7-10 and 12-13 *;
 [X]US5609978  (GIORGIANNI EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * see figures 7-9 and 11-14 *