Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035399

EP1035399 - Dual mode semi-active laser/laser radar seeker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.10.2006  [2006/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lockheed Martin Corporation
6801 Rockledge Drive
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Minor, Lewis G.
3708 Falcon Lake
Arlington, Texas 76016 / US
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date00200617.922.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateUS1999026341105.03.1999         Original published format: US 263411
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035399
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035399
Date:02.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41G7/22
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit zwei Betriebsarten arbeitender semiaktiver Laser/Laserradar Sucher[2000/37]
English:Dual mode semi-active laser/laser radar seeker[2000/37]
French:Chercheur à double mode semi-actif laser/radar laser[2000/37]
Examination procedure02.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
27.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2005Fee for grant paid
02.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3615266  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,11,24,31 * abstract * * column 3, line 64 - column 7, line 32; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,12-14,25,32,33;
 [A]EP0102466  (EGO ENTWICKLUNGSGES OPTRONIK [DE]) [A] 1-9,11-20,24-29,31-34 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 3; figure . *;
 [AD]US4085910  (BAKER WILLIAM G, et al) [AD] 1-4,11-14,24,25,31-33 * column A * * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US4383663  (NICHOLS ROY L) [A] 1-5,11-14,24,25,31-34 * column A * * column 2, line 11 - column 5, line 24; figures 1-7 *