Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039238

EP1039238 - A mounting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sigarth AB
Box 45
330 33 Hillerstorp / SE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Hageberg, Thorleif
Brogatan 12
330 33 Hillerstorp / SE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Wallengren, Yngvar
Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB
Box 116
331 21 Värnamo / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Wallengren, Yngvar
Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116
331 21 Värnamo / SE
Application number, filing date00200907.414.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateSE1999000101319.03.1999         Original published format: SE 9901013
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039238
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039238
Date:23.10.2002
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039238
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F24D9/02, F24D19/02
[2002/43]
Former International [2000/39]F24D9/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Fixiervorrichtung[2000/39]
English:A mounting device[2000/39]
French:Dispositif de montage[2000/39]
Examination procedure25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
28.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2005Fee for grant paid
07.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.08.2005
CY10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
FR10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
GB14.03.2006
IE14.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/27]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
GB14.03.2006
IE14.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/12]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
IE14.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/08]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/26]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/25]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/14]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI10.08.2005
SE10.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29715031U  (GOTTBEHUET HANS GERD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5 * pages 6-8; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19838113  (GOTTBEHUET HANS GERD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * columns 1-6; figures 2,5 *;
 [A]DE29800906U  (SIGARTH AB [SE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0982549  (SIGARTH IND AB [SE]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0950864  (SIGARTH IND AB [SE]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantDE29715031U
 EP19980850056