Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039171

EP1039171 - Gearbox, in particular for motorcycles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moto Guzzi S.p.A.
Via E.V. Parodi, 57
23826 Mandello del Lario / IT
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Todero, Umberto
Via Volta, 14/r
23826 Mandello del Lario (Lecco) / IT
[2000/39]
Representative(s)De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/39]Parisi, Luigi , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
I-20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00200911.614.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0055719.03.1999         Original published format: IT MI990557
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039171
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039171
Date:16.01.2002
[2002/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16H3/093
[2000/39]
Designated contracting states[2002/40]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltgetriebe für Motorräder[2000/39]
English:Gearbox, in particular for motorcycles[2000/39]
French:Bôite de vitesses pour motocyclettes[2000/39]
Examination procedure17.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
27.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.10.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.10.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9600863  (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 16 - line 24 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0304275  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 39 - line 44 * * column 2, line 48 - line 57 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US5014566  (KASHIWASE HAJIME [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 1, line 49 - line 52 * * figures 1,3,6 *;
 [Y]US4388979  (FRITZENWENGER JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 1-6,10,11 * column 1, line 6 - line 35 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0079176  (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [Y] 1-6,10,11 * page 1, line 1 - line 14 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4029710  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 19 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]BE376848  (ARIEL WORKS LTD.) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]BE373569  (STURMEY ARCHER GEARS LTD.) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2660070  (GUSTAVE MAGIS AUGUSTE ADELIN) [A] 4,5 * column 1, line 32 - line 44 * * column 3, line 73 - line 75 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]GB208370  (ARTHUR ALLTREE) [A] 4,5 * page 1, line 6 - line 12 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4738150  (MINER HUGH L [US]) [A] 4,5 * figures 1,2 *