Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043133

EP1043133 - Tile production press with two-layer charging device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martinelli Ettore s.r.l.
Viale G.S. Caboto, 61
41049 Sassuolo (Modena) / IT
[2000/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Mammi, Zeno
Via Radici in Piano, 72
42014 Castellarano (Reggio Emilia) / IT
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Faraggiana, Vittorio
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l.
Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing.
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00201174.030.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0069802.04.1999         Original published format: IT MI990698
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043133
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043133
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:B28B13/02
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Presse zum Herstellen von Fliesen mit einer Fördervorrichtung für zwei Materialschichten[2000/41]
English:Tile production press with two-layer charging device[2000/41]
French:Presse pour la fabrication de carreaux avec dispositif d'alimentation pour deux couches de matériaux[2000/41]
Examination procedure01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
07.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0894591  (ARIOSTEA S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0873832  (SACMI [IT]) [X] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *;
 [PX]EP0941826  (LB OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA [IT]) [PX] 1,12 * figure -; claim - *