Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057548

EP1057548 - Double function bending blade for sheet metal bending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SALVAGNINI ITALIA S.p.A.
Via Monticello di Fara, 42
I-36040 Sarego (Vicenza) / IT
[2000/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Kunze, Wolfgang
Gaumbergstrasse 82
4060 Leonding / AT
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Mittler, Enrico
Mittler & C. S.r.l.
Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Mittler, Enrico
c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00201430.619.04.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0105814.05.1999         Original published format: IT MI991058
[2000/49]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1057548
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1057548
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057548
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21D5/04
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:Biegemesser mit zweifacher Funktion für Blech-Abkantmaschine[2000/49]
English:Double function bending blade for sheet metal bending machine[2000/49]
French:Lame de pliage à double function pour machine pour cintrer la tôle[2000/49]
Examination procedure22.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
04.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Fee for grant paid
10.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.08.2003   
IHARA, Yoshiaki
Echu-jima 1-3-1-509, Kohto-ku
135-0044 TOKYO / JP
Opponent's representative
Klitzsch, Gottfried
Grünecker Kinkeldey
Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/43]
Opponent(s)01  26.08.2003   
IHARA Yoshiaki
Echu-jima 1-3-1-509 Kohto-ku
JP-135-0044 TOKYO / JP
Opponent's representative
Klitzsch, Gottfried
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
02.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.04.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.04.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR27.11.2002
CY19.04.2003
LU19.04.2003
PT19.04.2003
IE21.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
[2008/29]
Former [2005/02]GR27.11.2002
CY19.04.2003
LU19.04.2003
IE21.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
Former [2004/44]GR27.11.2002
CY19.04.2003
LU19.04.2003
IE21.04.2003
Former [2004/39]GR27.11.2002
LU19.04.2003
IE21.04.2003
Former [2004/29]GR27.11.2002
IE21.04.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0679455  (SALVAGNINI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3,6 *;
 [A]EP0679456  (SALVAGNINI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0567193  (SAPIM AMADA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4356716  (ASCHAUER HANS) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-6 *