Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020295

EP1020295 - Ink jet recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Kouichirou
Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
02 / Kotaka, Toshikazu
Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
03 / Shimomura, Masaki
Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
04 / Kashiwabara, Kazutoshi
Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
05 / Yasue, Takuya
Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date00201435.505.09.1996
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateJP1995026487619.09.1995         Original published format: JP 26487695
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020295
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020295
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP31.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J13/10, B41J29/393
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren[2000/29]
English:Ink jet recording method[2000/29]
French:Procédé d'enregistrement d'images à jet d'encre[2000/29]
Examination procedure09.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
03.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2002Fee for grant paid
05.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96306438.1  / EP0768187
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH02245356  ;
 [A]JPH0735579  ;
 [A]JPH03159746  ;
 [A]JPH07205416  ;
 [A]JPH02303842
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901218), vol. 014, no. 570, Database accession no. (M - 1060), [DA] 1-14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [A] 1-14,16,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911004), vol. 015, no. 393, Database accession no. (M - 1165), [A] 16,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [A] 10,16,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910227), vol. 015, no. 085, Database accession no. (M - 1087), [A] 16,17 * abstract *
by applicantJPH02245356