Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052071

EP1052071 - High-speed industrial handler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VORTEX SYSTEMS S.r.L.
Via Argine Volano 341/C I-44030 Fossalta di Copparo
Ferrara / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
VORTEX SYSTEMS S.r.L.
Via Argine Volano 341/C
I-44030 Fossalta di Copparo Ferrara / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Colamussi, Arturo
VIa Borso 8
44100 Ferrara / IT
[2000/46]
Representative(s)De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/46]Parisi, Luigi , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
I-20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00201629.304.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0098205.05.1999         Original published format: IT MI990982
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052071
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052071
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/10
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:Schnellaufender Industriemanipulator[2000/46]
English:High-speed industrial handler[2000/46]
French:Manipulateur industriel à grande vitesse[2000/46]
Examination procedure30.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
30.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2739801  (LESEURE MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - line 21 * * page 7, line 14 - line 18 * * page 8, line 8 - line 10 * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]US4809956  (DONZE MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 51 - line 56; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US4548544  (VAN APPLEDORN WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 3 * figures 1,7 *;
 [Y]FR2637832  (LEDENT CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4706004  (KOMATSU ISAMU [JP], et al) [A] 6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4275986  (ENGELBERGER JOSEPH F, et al) [A] 9 * figure 1 *