Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1030523

EP1030523 - Coding and decoding of digital video signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yonemitsu, Jun, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Suzuki, Teruhiko, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Yagasaki, Yoichi, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2009/46]
Former [2000/34]01 / Yonemitsu, Jun, Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Suzuki, Teruhiko, Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Yagasaki, Yoichi, Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00201794.520.09.1993
[2000/34]
Priority number, dateJP1992024979118.09.1992         Original published format: JP 24979192
JP1992024979218.09.1992         Original published format: JP 24979292
JP1993016674606.07.1993         Original published format: JP 16674693
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1030523
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1030523
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1030523
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesGB [2001/29]
Former [2000/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kodierung und Dekodierung von digitalen Bildsignalen[2000/34]
English:Coding and decoding of digital video signals[2000/34]
French:Codage et décodage de signaux vidéo numériques[2000/35]
Former [2000/34]Codage et décodage de signaux vidéo numeriques
Examination procedure22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
27.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2010Fee for grant paid
25.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93307422.1  / EP0588669
EP98203011.6  / EP0910213
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 11
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 12
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 13
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 14
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 16
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9106182  (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *
 [AD]  WOO PAIK, "DIGICIPHERTM-ALL DIGITAL, CHANNEL COMPATIBLE, HDTV BROADCAST SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19901201), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 245 - 254, XP000179349 [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.64474