Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058219

EP1058219 - Two step programming method of remote controller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.05.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.2011  [2011/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Parallelweg 2
7141 DC Groenlo / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Parallelweg 2
NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Kip, Harm Jakob
Lariksstraat 4
7132 CS Lichtenvoorde / NL
02 / Steentjes, Hendrikus Bernardus Maria
Koepeloven 27
7011 VJ Gaanderen / NL
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00201938.831.05.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateNL1999101220301.06.1999         Original published format: NL 1012203
[2000/49]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1058219
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08C19/28
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/34]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zwei-Stufen-Verfahren zur Programmierung von Fernsteuereinrichtung[2000/49]
English:Two step programming method of remote controller[2000/49]
French:Méthode de programmation de télécommande en deux étapes[2000/49]
Examination procedure06.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
07.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
16.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/24]
11.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.01.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
15.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201011   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5629868  (TESSIER ALAIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-6,8,11,13 * column 5, line 26 - line 57 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 9 *;
 [A]WO9406106  (SEIKI OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,9-11 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 1 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 34 *;
 [A]DE19605132  (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 51 *
 [XA]  "DEVICE SELECTION INDICATOR WITH REMOTE CONTROL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19930401), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 269 - 270, XP000364511 [X] 1,2,4,8 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,6
by applicantGB2259172
 US5629868
 WO9406106
 DE19605132
    ARMONK, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199304), vol. 36, no. 4,