Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1059299

EP1059299 - Process for the polymerisation of olefins in the presence of indenyl compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/50]Indenyl compounds for the polymerisation of olefins
[2003/27]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Polypropylenes B.V.
Poststraat 1
6135 KR Sittard / NL
For all designated states
SABIC Polyethylenes B.V.
Poststraat 1
6135 KR Sittard / NL
[2003/37]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Arts, Henricus Johannes
Montjoiestraat 4
6151 JD Munstergeleen / NL
02 / Kranenburg, Mirko
Koninksemstraat 115
6215 KA Maastricht / NL
03 / Meijers, Ramon Hubertus Anna Maria
Ridder Goswinstraat 8
6444 EA Brunssum / NL
04 / IJPEIJ, Edwin Gerard
Vrangendael 153
6136JN Sittard / NL
05 / GRUTER, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Veldwezeltstraat 22
6215JC Maastricht / NL
06 / BEIJER, Felix Hugo
Daerwinstraat 14
6132GW Sittard / NL
 [2003/51]
Former [2003/29]01 / Arts, Henricus Johannes
Montjoiestraat 4
6151 JD Munstergeleen / NL
02 / Kranenburg, Mirko
Koninksemstraat 115
6215 KA Maastricht / NL
03 / Meijers, Ramon Hubertus Anna Maria
Ridder Goswinstraat 8
6444 EA Brunssum / NL
04 / IJPEIJ, Edwin Gerard
Vrangendael 153
6136JN Sittard / NL
05 / GRUTER, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Veldwezeltsraat 22
6215JC Maastricht / NL
06 / BEIJER, Felix Hugo
Daerwinstraat 14
6132GW Sittard / NL
Former [2001/45]01 / Arts, Henrics Johannes
Montjoiestraat 4
6151 JD Musntergeleen / NL
02 / Kranenburg, Mirko
Koninksemstraat 115
6215 KA Maastricht / NL
03 / Meijers, Ramon Hubertus Anna Maria
Ridder Goswinstraat 8
6444 EA Brunssum / NL
04 / IJPEIJ, Edwin Gerard
Vrangendael 153
6136JN Sittard / NL
05 / GRUTER, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Veldwezeltsraat 22
6215JC Maastricht / NL
06 / BEIJER, Felix Hugo
Daerwinstraat 14
6132GW Sittard / NL
Former [2000/50]01 / Arts, Henrics Johannes
Montjoiestraat 4
6151 JD Musntergeleen / NL
02 / Kranenburg, Mirko
Koninksemstraat 115
6215 KA Maastricht / NL
03 / Meijers, Ramon Hubertus Anna Maria
Ridder Goswinstraat 8
6444 EA Brunssum / NL
Representative(s)Scheltus, Irma , et al
DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]Scheltus, Irma , et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks, P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
Application number, filing date00202021.207.06.2000
[2000/50]
Priority number, dateEP1999020185611.06.1999         Original published format: EP 99201856
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1059299
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1059299
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F17/00, C07C13/465, C07F7/08, C08F10/00
[2000/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Polymerisation von Olefinen in Anwesenheit von Indenylverbindungen.[2003/27]
English:Process for the polymerisation of olefins in the presence of indenyl compounds[2003/27]
French:Procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines en présence de composés à base d'indényle[2003/27]
Former [2000/50]Indenylverbindungen zur Polymerisation von Olefinen
Former [2000/50]Indenyl compounds for the polymerisation of olefins
Former [2000/50]Composés à base d'indényle pour l'olymérisation d'oléfines
Examination procedure16.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
13.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2003Fee for grant paid
02.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
PT17.05.2004
IE07.06.2004
LU07.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
IE07.06.2004
LU07.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
IE07.06.2004
LU07.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
LU07.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/11]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9411406  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,9,17 * the whole document *
Examination   - ELLIS W.W. ET AL, "Synthesis, Structure and Properties of Chiral Titanium and Zirconium Complexes Bearing Biaryl Strapped Substituted Cyclopentadienyl Ligands", ORGANOMETALLICS, (1993), vol. 12, pages 4391 - 4401