Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162047

EP1162047 - An apparatus for distributing powders on a support in a predefined pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
System S.p.A.
Via Ghiarola Vecchia 73
41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
SYSTEM S.p.A.
Via Ghiarola Vecchia 73
41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
SYSTEM S.p.A.
Via Ghiarola Vecchia 73
Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Ronflette S.A.
No. 32, Rue A. Neyen
2233 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / Stefani, Franco
No. 1, Via P. Ferrari
41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A.
Via M. Vellani, 20
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date00202044.408.06.2000
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162047
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162047
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B28B11/04, B28B11/00, B05C19/04
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2002/36]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verteilen von pülverförmigen Materialen in einem vorherbestimmten Muster auf einen Träger[2001/50]
English:An apparatus for distributing powders on a support in a predefined pattern[2001/50]
French:Dispositif pour distribuer suivant un dessin déterminé des matériaux pulvérulents sur un support[2001/50]
Examination procedure30.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
13.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2004Fee for grant paid
19.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE
Opposition(s)30.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2559543  (GEBHARD MUENCH CARL) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,10,12;
 [XA]EP0634516  (TARAFLEX [FR]) [X] 1,3,6,7,12 * the whole document * * column 5, line 13 - column 5, line 30 * [A] 2,4,5;
 [A]BR9401031  ;
 [A]JPS6327314  ;
 [A]CA1218622  (BRUNSWICK MINING & SMELTING) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9518020  (CAMORANI CARLO ANTONIO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0822043  (SYFAL SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 05, Database accession no. 1996-040619, XP002149697 & BRPI9401031 A 19951128 (BERRONDO A L) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880629), vol. 012, no. 229, Database accession no. (M - 714), & JP63027314 A 19880205 (NITTA KK) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *