Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1145948

EP1145948 - Two-hand surfboard for bodysurfing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zapatero, Héctor
Via Fra Christoforo, 14/b
20142 Milano (MI) / IT
[2001/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/42]
Application number, filing date00202631.821.07.2000
[2001/42]
Priority number, dateIT2007MI0009011.04.2000         Original published format: IT MI200790
[2001/42]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1145948
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1145948
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B63B35/79, // A63B31/10
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   PT [2002/27]
Former [2001/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweihändiges Gleitbrett für das Bodysurfing[2001/42]
English:Two-hand surfboard for bodysurfing[2001/42]
French:Planche de surf corporelle à deux mains[2001/42]
Examination procedure20.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
04.04.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
31.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2002Fee for grant paid
06.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT11.03.2003
[2003/29]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4439165  (ROTHSTEIN ANDREW M [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 5 * [Y] 3,4,6-8;
 [YA]US5603645  (SACCOMANNO TOM F [US]) [Y] 3,6,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - line 45 * [A] 1,2,10;
 [YA]FR1163564  (WEBER RENÉ) [Y] 4 * figures 1,2,4,5; claim 4 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US5324220  (STEWART MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 1,2;
 [A]US4929207  (PIATT JOHN A [US]) [A] 1,2,4,10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5472362  (DANDURAND WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - line 31 * * column 3, line 3 - line 11 *
by applicantUS4437842
 US5167551
 US4932911