Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079268

EP1079268 - A print having attached audio data storage and method of providing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tutt, Lee W., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Spurr, Robert W., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Tehranchi, Babak, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Sanger, Kurt M., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
05 / Tredwell, Timothy J., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/11]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2008/30]Lee, Brenda , et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2003/50]Barker, Brenda , et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2001/09]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00202718.331.07.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateUS1999037244211.08.1999         Original published format: US 372442
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1079268
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1079268
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:G03B31/06, G03B17/24, G03B21/134, G03D15/00, G06K19/067
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/46]
Former [2001/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abzug und damit verbundener Audiodatenspeicher sowie Verfahren zu seiner Bereitstellung[2001/09]
English:A print having attached audio data storage and method of providing same[2001/09]
French:Tirage avec une mémoire pour des données audio attaché et procédé de réalisation[2001/09]
Examination procedure07.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2002Fee for grant paid
16.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.07.2003  28.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
Opponent's representative
Terrell, David Richard
AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Patent Administration, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/42]
Opponent(s)01  01.07.2003  28.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
Opponent's representative
Terrell, David Richard
Agfa-Gevaert N.V., Corporate Intellectual Property, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2003/35]
Opponent(s)01  01.07.2003  28.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
04.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.05.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2009
25.05.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
24.08.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.09.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5878292  (SWEDE HELEN ET AL) [A] 1,4-8,11-16,19-23,25-30 * column 5, line 21 - column 14, line 37; figures 1-10,13,58-74 *;
 [AD]US5528222  (COTEUS PAUL W ET AL) [AD] 1-3,8,9,16-18,23,24 * column 2, line 65 - column 7, line 39; figures 1-6,9-13 *;
 [AD]US4905029  (KELLEY SCOTT A) [AD] 1,4,8,10,13-16,19,22,23,25,29,30 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 50; figures 1-8 *;
 [AD]US5521663  (NORRIS III WYAMN J) [AD] 1,4-8,10,12,14-16,19-23,25-27,29,30 * column 9, line 63 - column 15, line 32; figures 4-13 *;
 [A]WO9840930  (PRECISION DYNAMICS CORP) [A] 1-3,8,9,16-18,23,24 * page 2, line 10 - page 10, line 5; figures 1-6 *