EP1074534 - Process for the production of hydrocarbons with a high octane number by the selective dimerization of isobutene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | For all designated states ECOFUEL S.p.A. Viale Brenta 27/29 20139 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Ecofuel S.p.A. Viale Brenta 27/29 20139 Milan / IT | |||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Ecofuel S.p.A. Viale Brenta 27/29 20139 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Girolamo, Marco Via Ferrandina 10/A 20097 San Donato Milanese / IT | 02 /
Marchionna, Mario Viale Abruzzi 44 20131 Milan / IT | 03 /
Tagliabue, Lorenzo Via dei Tigli 15 20095 Cusano Milanino / IT | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00202745.6 | 01.08.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01765 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: IT MI991765 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074534 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074534 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/08, C10G50/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C07C2/08 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, GR, NL [2001/43] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kohlenwasserstoffen mit hoher Oktanzahl durch selektiven Dimerizierung von Isobuten | [2001/06] | English: | Process for the production of hydrocarbons with a high octane number by the selective dimerization of isobutene | [2001/06] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'hydrocarbures à haut indice d'octane par dimerisation sélectve d'isobutène | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 23.02.2002 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4100220 (BOWMAN WILLIAM G, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0467345 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [DA]US5723687 (MARCHIONNA MARIO [IT], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2325237 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * | other | EP0994088 |