Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083224

EP1083224 - Apoptin-associating protein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leadd B.V.
Wassenaarseweg 72
2333 AL Leiden / NL
[2001/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Noteborn, Mathieu Hubertus Maria
Zeeforel 14
2318 MP Leiden / NL
02 / Danen-van Oorschot, Astrid Adriana Anna Maria
Berliozplein 19
2561 VG Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00203042.701.09.2000
[2001/11]
Priority number, dateEP1999020285802.09.1999         Original published format: EP 99202858
EP1999020346521.10.1999         Original published format: EP 99203465
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1083224
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1083224
Date:25.04.2001
[2001/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1083224
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/19, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61K31/713, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/50
[2001/15]
Former International [2001/11]C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/19, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/11]
TitleGerman:Apoptin bindendes Protein[2001/11]
English:Apoptin-associating protein[2001/11]
French:Protéine liant l' apoptine[2001/11]
Examination procedure25.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
24.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
14.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2006Fee for grant paid
19.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200203   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE]
Licencee:Schering AG
-
13342 Berlin / DE
Date:30.10.2002
[2006/49]
Former [2002/51]ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:Schering AG
-
13342 Berlin / DE
Date:30.10.2002
[2006/49]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9928460  (LEADD BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-13,15,17-33 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0924296  (LEADD BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,8-13,15,17-33 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9928461  (LEADD BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-13,15,17-33 * claim 8 *;
 [PX]WO9957144  (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-18,22 * SeqIdNo.43: 100.0% identity in 228 aa overlap with SeqIdNo.10 / SeqIdNo.108: 98.9% identity in 1046 bp overlap with SeqIdNo.9 *;
 [AD]WO9641191  (AESCULAAP BV [NL]);
 [DA]WO9846760  (LEADD BV [NL], et al);
 [DA]WO9908108  (LEADD BV [NL], et al)
 [XD]  - GARCIA E ET AL, "RYBP, a new repressor protein that interacts with components of the mammalian Polycomb complex, and with the transcription factor YY1", EMBO JOURNAL., (19990615), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 3404 - 3418, XP002131759 [XD] 1-4,6-18 * 98.7% identity in 226 aa overlap with SeqIdNo.10 / 91.1% identity in 824 nt overlap with SeqIdNo.9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/18.12.3404
 [X]  - ZHENG L ET AL, "Homo sapiens death effector domain-associated factor mRNA, complete cds", DATABASE EMHUM1, E.M.B.L. Databases, (19990901), XP002160804 [X] 1-18 * abstract *
 [X]  - WOESSNER J ET AL, "Homo sapiens full length insert cDNA clone YI44E12", DATABASE EM_HUM, E.B.I., Hinxton, U.K., (19980829), XP002160805 [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [PX]  - SAWA C ET AL, "Homo sapiens YEAF1 mRNA for YY1 and E4TF1 associated Factor 1, complete cds", DATABASE EM_HUM, E.B.I., Hinxton, U.K., (20000119), XP002160806 [PX] 1-18,22 * abstract *
 [DA]  - DANEN-VAN OORSCHOT A A A M ET AL, "APOPTIN INDUCES APOPTOSIS IN HUMAN TRANSFORMED AND MALIGNANT CELLS BUT NOT IN NORMAL CELLS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19970501), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5843 - 5847, XP002052232

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.11.5843
 [A]  - ZHUANG S -M ET AL, "APOPTIN, A PROTEIN DERIVED FROM CHICKEN ANEMIA VIRUS, INDUCES P53- INDEPENDENT APOPTOSIS IN HUMAN OSTEOSARCOMA CELLS", CANCER RESEARCH,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, (19950201), vol. 55, no. 3, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 486 - 489, XP000602162
 [A]  - KALENIK J ET AL, "Yeast two-hybrid cloning of a novel zinc finger protein that interacts with the multifunctional transcription factor YY1", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., (19970215), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 843 - 849, XP002160803