EP1084633 - "Garment provided with at least one luminescent means" [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isis Trust 191, Merchants Street Valletta, VLT10 / MT | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polvara, Luca Via Bonfantini, 10 22040 Bosisio Parini (Lecco) / IT | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/12] | Marchi, Massimo, et al c/o Marchi & Partners s.r.l., Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00203123.5 | 11.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01916 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: IT MI991916 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084633 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/01, G08B5/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G08B5/004 (EP);
A41D13/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kleidungsstücke mit Leuchtmittel | [2001/12] | English: | "Garment provided with at least one luminescent means" | [2001/12] | French: | Vêtement pourvu d'un moyen luminescent | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0115478 (JEROME JACQUES) [A] 1,9,10 * page 4, line 17 - line 19 * * page 4, line 29; claims 5,6 *; | [Y]GB2164541 (BACON ALBERT EDWARD, et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 1, line 46 * * page 1, line 57 - line 62; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US5151678 (VELTRI JEFFREY A [CA], et al) [A] 1,7,10,12 * column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 53 - line 68 * * column 4, line 19; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5245516 (DE HAAS JOAN O [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,12 * column 1, line 49 - line 52 ** column 1, line 60; figure - *; | [A]US5676451 (TABANERA DENNIS A [US]) [A] 1,7,8,12 * column 1, line 34 * * column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 67 * * column 3, line 38 - line 41; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US5688038 (CHIEN TSENG LU [TW]) [A] 1,2,7,9,12 * column 2, line 36 * * column 2, line 48 - line 50 * * column 5, line 21 * * column 5, line 37; figures 1,11 *; | [Y]DE29718617U (HOELZL CHRISTIAN [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 3; figures 1,2; claim 1 * |