EP1085673 - Coupling network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/12] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wendt, Matthias Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Budde, Wolfgang Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Fuhrmann, Peter Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/31] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/10] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/12] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00203164.9 | 12.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999143895 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19943895 | DE1999160470 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19960470 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085673 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/56, H01F27/28 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H04B3/56 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H01F27/2847 (EP,US);
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04L25/0266 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5445 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerkkoppler | [2001/12] | English: | Coupling network | [2001/12] | French: | Réseau de couplage | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 25.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 26.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4080585 (MOLTHEN EDWARD HENRY) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US4621170 (PICANDET JEAN A [FR]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 19 - line 53 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 50 *; | [A]US5168440 (SPREEN JAMES H [US]) [A] 1-10* column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 9; figure 2 *; | [X]US5789959 (DIELACHER FRANZ [AT], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 10 - line 37 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 10 * | by applicant | US5789959 |