Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091243

EP1091243 - Battery contact for a single use camera [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Solomon, Jeffrey A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Carducci, Mark S., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/16]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2001/15]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00203313.225.09.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateUS1999041292705.10.1999         Original published format: US 412927
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091243
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091243
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03B19/04, G03B17/02, H01M2/10
[2004/05]
Former International [2001/15]G03B19/04, G03B17/02
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/43]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Batterie-Kontakt für eine Einweg-Kamera[2001/15]
English:Battery contact for a single use camera[2001/15]
French:Contact de batterie pour une caméra jetable[2001/15]
Examination procedure29.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/17]
23.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.09.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.09.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5337099  (TASAKA HISASHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * figures 7,8 * * abstract *;
 [X]JPH04372195  ;
 [A]US4954858  (OHMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930519), vol. 017, no. 253, Database accession no. (E - 1367), [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract *