Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069304

EP1069304 - Force-balanced sonic flow emission control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Inc.
700 Park Avenue
Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/27]For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Inc.
700 Park Avenue
Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
SIEMENS CANADA LIMITED
2185 Derry Road West
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 7A6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Van Kampen, Leo
R.R. No. 1, Dover Centre
Ontario, Canada N0P 1L0 / CA
02 / Cook, John Edward
17 Kingsway Drive, Chatham
Ontario, Canada N7L 2S8 / CA
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Siemens House
Oldbury, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Former [2002/27]Allen, Derek
Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34
80506 Munich / DE
Former [2001/03]Allen, Derek
Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date00203572.323.05.1997
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateUS1996066255413.06.1996         Original published format: US 662554
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069304
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069304
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069304
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M25/08
[2001/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/03]
TitleGerman:Kraftausgeglichenes Geräuschemissionsregelventil[2001/03]
English:Force-balanced sonic flow emission control valve[2001/03]
French:Soupape de régulation des émissions de flux sonique à force équilibrée[2001/03]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
10.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2002Fee for grant paid
03.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97922771.7  / EP0904487
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5413082  (COOK JOHN E [CA], et al) [AD] 1,6,9,15 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4703737  (COOK JOHN E [CA], et al) [A] 1,6,15 * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 9; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5280775  (TANAMURA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,15 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5509395  (COOK JOHN E [CA]) [A] 6 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2641334  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])
by applicantUS5373822
 US5413082