EP1099954 - MR apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/48] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/41] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/20] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Overweg, Johannes Adrianus, Dr. Philips Corp. Intel.Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Warmuth, Carsten Philips Corp. Intel.Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Leussler, Christoph Günther Philips Corp. Intel.Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Röschmann, Peter Karl Hermann Philips Corp. Intel.Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00203794.3 | 31.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE1999153748 | 09.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953748 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099954 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099954 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099954 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/385 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G01R33/385 (EP,US);
G01R33/3852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/51] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MR-Gerät | [2001/20] | English: | MR apparatus | [2001/20] | French: | Appareil de RM | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/28] | NL | 29.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0313213 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DA] 1,7 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 42 * * column 5, line 47 - column 5, line 51; figure 2 *; | [A]US5574373 (PAUSCH GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 30 - column 5, line 42; figure 18 * |