Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101708

EP1101708 - Food wrapping material for home use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuova Poliver di Oddone Colomba & C. S.n.c.
Località Bessiche 43
15070 Tagliolo Monferrato (AL) / IT
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Malaspina, Alberto
Via Vela 10
15076 Ovada (AL) / IT
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Spandonari, Carlo
Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l.
Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16
10129 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Spandonari, Carlo, Dr. Ing.
Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00203864.406.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO00202U16.11.1999         Original published format: IT TO990202 U
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101708
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D65/10, B65D75/26, B65D75/40
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Für den Hausgebrauch bestimmte Verpackungsfolie für Nahrungsmittel[2001/21]
English:Food wrapping material for home use[2001/21]
French:Feuille d'emballage pour produits alimentaires destiné à l'usage domestique[2001/21]
Examination procedure27.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
16.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2775252  (PAPIERS A PAVIOT [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 25 - line 35 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3193181  (PETER KONJEVICH, et al)