Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094459

EP1094459 - Disk storage and retrieval [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC. (a Delaware corporation)
Sony Drive Park Ridge
New Jersey 07656 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC. (a Delaware corporation)
Sony Drive
Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pollard, Christopher A.
1060 South Park Drive
Monument, CO 80132 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)DeVile, Jonathan Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]DeVile, Jonathan Mark , et al
D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00203962.620.09.1995
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateUS1994032672120.10.1994         Original published format: US 326721
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1094459
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094459
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/22
[2001/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/17]
TitleGerman:Plattenspeicherung und -wiederauffindung[2001/17]
English:Disk storage and retrieval[2001/17]
French:Stockage et recherche de disque[2001/17]
Examination procedure05.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2003Fee for grant paid
17.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95306649.5  / EP0708442
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
09.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0389160  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 27, line 14 - column 30, line 18; figures 25-29 *;
 [X]EP0293242  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 3-5 * column 1, line 38 - line 55; figure 1 *