EP1113284 - MR method of excitation of nuclear magnetization in a limited spatial region [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/50] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/27] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Steffen, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsbugerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Lüdeke, Kai-Michael, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsbugerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00204061.6 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | DE1999156595 | 25.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956595 | [2001/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113284 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113284 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113284 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/28, A61B5/055 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
G01R33/4838 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/12] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MR-Verfahren zur Anregung der Kernmagnetisierung in einem begrenzten räumlichen Bereich | [2001/27] | English: | MR method of excitation of nuclear magnetization in a limited spatial region | [2001/27] | French: | Procédé RM d'excitation de la magnétisation nucléaire dans une région spatiale limitée | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.12.2005 | [2006/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3500456 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1,5-8 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure 3A; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9919739 (MELZER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* page 15, paragraph 4 - page 16, paragraph 2; figure 2E *; | [AD]EP0928972 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0024] , [0037] * |