Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101412

EP1101412 - Use of a high-ester pectin in acidic, protein-containing foodstuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  05.09.2008
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Revocation of patentpublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DANISCO A/S
Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K. / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
DANISCO A/S
Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K. / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Christensen, Tove Martel Ida Elsa
Soengen 30
3450 Allerod / DK
02 / Kreiberg, Jette Dina
Dueholm 18
4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / Thorsoe, Hanne
Lodbrogsvej 30, Gram
8660 Skanderborg / DK
04 / Buchholt, Hans Christian
Sivangevej 16
8220 Brabrand / DK
05 / Rasmussen, Preben
Saebylund, Boegegaardsvej 1, Saeby
4070 Kirke Hyllinge / DK
06 / Nielsen, John
Engvej 38
2300 Copenhagen K / DK
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Harding, Charles Thomas
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00204485.712.07.1996
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateGB1995001443814.07.1995         Original published format: GB 9514438
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101412
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101412
Date:08.08.2001
[2001/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101412
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/0524, A23C9/137, A23C9/154, A23C21/08
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesAL13.12.2000
LT13.12.2000
LV13.12.2000
SI13.12.2000
TitleGerman:Verwendung von hoch-verestertem Pektin in sauren, proteinhaltigen Nahrungsmitteln[2001/21]
English:Use of a high-ester pectin in acidic, protein-containing foodstuffs[2001/21]
French:Utilisation de pectine à haut degré d'esterification dans des produits alimentaires acides contenant des protéines[2001/21]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure13.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/21]
12.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
29.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2005Fee for grant paid
24.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96925730.2  / EP0839006
Divisional application(s)EP05021763.7  / EP1621082
EP05022863.4  / EP1625796
EP07008750.7   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 31.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.09.2006  28.09.2006  ADMISSIBLE
CP KELCO ApS
Ved Banen 16
4623 Lille Skensved / DK
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/44]
Opponent(s)01  21.09.2006  28.09.2006  ADMISSIBLE
CP KELCO ApS
Ved Banen 16
4623 Lille Skensved / DK
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
26.10.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.04.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2008
11.04.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/41]
Request for further processing for:07.01.2005Request for further processing filed
07.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
IE12.07.2006
LU12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
[2008/36]
Former [2007/35]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
IE12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/25]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
IE12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/19]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2006/48]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/38]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0709033  (YAKULT HONSHA KK [JP]) [XP] 1-12 * claims 1-4 * * the whole document *;
 [XP]JPH08112059  ;
 [PXD]EP0664300  (HERCULES INC [US]) [PXD] 1-12 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 41 * * example 14 *;
 [X]PL306079  (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-12
 [XD]  - GLAHN P E ET AL, "CASEIN-PECTIN INTERACTION IN SOUR MILK BEVERAGES", SYMPOSIUM ON FOOD INGREDIENTS EUROPE,XX,XX, (19941004), pages 252 - 256, XP000604284 [XD] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - A.C.M. VAN HOOYDONK, "De Bereiding van Drinkyoghurt: 2. De Invloed van de Produktsamenstelling", VOEDINGSMIDDELEN TECHNOLOGIE, ZEIST NL, (1982), vol. 15, no. 20, pages 25 - 29, XP000609036 [X] 11,12 * page 27, column L * * table 2 *
 [XP]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 28, Database accession no. 96-271372, XP002016404 & JPH08112059 A 19960507 (NITTA GELATIN KK) [XP] 1-12 * abstract *