Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095873

EP1095873 - Carton having shock-absorbing carrying handle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC
One High Ridge Park Stamford
Connecticut 06905 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC
One High Ridge Park
Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
THE MEAD CORPORATION
Courthouse Plaza NE
Dayton Ohio 45463 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bates, Aaron
2431 Rachelm Court
Marietta, Georgia 30066 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Avidity IP
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2001/18]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB
Application number, filing date00204607.604.01.1996
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1995036818504.01.1995         Original published format: US 368185
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095873
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095873
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095873
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D71/14, B65D71/30
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Verpackungskarton mit schockabsorbierendem Tragegriff[2001/18]
English:Carton having shock-absorbing carrying handle[2001/18]
French:Carton d'emballage avec poignée de transport absorbant les chocs[2001/18]
Examination procedure18.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
12.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2003Fee for grant paid
10.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96902684.8  / EP0810957
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
[2013/51]
Former [2005/18]DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]SE30.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2475497  (NICOLLET HUGUES SA [FR]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * page 5, line 15 - line 35; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]FR2064523  (EMBALLAGES PUBLIC FSE) [A] 1,4,7-9 * figure -; claim . *
by applicantUS4222485
 US4077095
 US5131588
 US4545485
 US4784266
 US5000313
 FR19690027932