Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1093760

EP1093760 - Spinal distractor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KARLIN TECHNOLOGY, INC.
26893 Bouquet Canyon Road Suite C, PMB 196
Saugus, CA 91350 / US
[2004/17]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
KARLIN TECHNOLOGY, INC.
4929 Premiere Avenue
Lakewood, California 90712 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Michelson, Gary Karlin
438 Sherman Canal
Venice, California 90291 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Viering, Hans-Martin , et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Viering, Hans-Martin , et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2004/01]Viering, Hans-Martin, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2001/17]Hodkinson, Keith Leonard , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date00204831.209.06.1994
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateUS1993007478110.06.1993         Original published format: US 74781
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1093760
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1093760
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1093760
Date:17.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61F2/44, A61B17/02
[2001/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/17]
TitleGerman:Wirbeldistraktor[2004/19]
English:Spinal distractor[2001/17]
French:Ecarteur Spinal[2001/17]
Former [2001/17]Rückgratausdehnvorrichtung
Examination procedure23.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
27.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2004Fee for grant paid
17.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94920704.7  / EP0703757
Divisional application(s)EP04027215.5  / EP1508307
Opposition(s)18.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US3486505  (MORRISON GORDON M) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0421485  (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 35 *;
 [A]US4777939  (KEES JR GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 8 *;
 [A]US3848601  (MA G, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 7-37 *;
 [A]EP0077159  (ATKINS BRIAN NORMAN [GB], et al) [A] * figure 5 *
by applicantUS3867728
 US4349921
 US4309777
 US3875595
 US2372622
 US4553273
 US4401112
 US4554914