Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065683

EP1065683 - Circuit breaker with terminals for different rated currents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bach, Michael
Ligusterweg 20a
12437 Berlin / DE
02 / Schmidt, Detlev
Richardstrasse 61
12055 Berlin / DE
03 / Sebekow, Michael
Spinolastrasse 8
13125 Berlin / DE
04 / Thiede, Ingo
Fregestrasse 76
12159 Berlin / DE
05 / Seidler-Stahl, Günter
Sternstrasse 11
13359 Berlin / DE
06 / Türkmen, Sezai
Schuckertdamm 334
13629 Berlin / DE
[2001/01]
Application number, filing date00250212.827.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateDE199913081330.06.1999         Original published format: DE 19930813
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065683
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065683
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1065683
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01H1/58, H01H71/06, H01H71/08, H01H71/04
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/51]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungsschalter mit Anschlussschienen für verschiedene Nennströme[2001/01]
English:Circuit breaker with terminals for different rated currents[2001/01]
French:Disjoncteur aves des bornes pour plusieurs intensités nominales[2002/32]
Former [2001/01]Disjonteur avec des bornes pour plusieurs intensités nominales
Examination procedure22.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
14.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2002Fee for grant paid
03.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19643607  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 66; figure 3; claim - *;
 [DA]DE4416105  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0225207  (MERLIN GERIN [FR])