blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1087614

EP1087614 - Apparatus and method for automatic color correction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2010
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.2010  [2010/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsukada, Masato
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Grubesallee 26
22143 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00250315.922.09.2000
[2001/13]
Priority number, dateJP1999026793722.09.1999         Original published format: JP 26793799
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1087614
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1087614
Date:02.04.2003
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1087614
Date:15.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/60, H04N1/62
[2003/14]
CPC:
H04N1/628 (EP,US); H04N1/6075 (EP,US); H04N1/62 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2001/13]H04N1/60
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/01]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Farbkorrekturvorrichtung und -verfahren[2001/13]
English:Apparatus and method for automatic color correction[2001/13]
French:Appareil et procédé de correction de couleurs automatique[2001/13]
Examination procedure08.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
28.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2009Fee for grant paid
14.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4386267  (YAMADA MITSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,7,10 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2304484  (SCITEX CORP LTD [IL]) [A] 1,7,10* page 7 - page 10; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.