EP1095636 - Stent having an uneven coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2006/23] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaldach, Max Turnstrasse 5 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Kranz, Curt Forststrasse 48 14163 Berlin / DE | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/18] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00250344.9 | 19.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | DE19991051477 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951477 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095636 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1095636 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095636 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/08, A61F2/06 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61L31/088 (EP,US);
A61F2002/072 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0026 (EP,US);
A61L2400/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | A61F2/08, A61L31/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2004/19] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stent mit ungleichmässiger Beschichtung | [2001/18] | English: | Stent having an uneven coating | [2001/18] | French: | Stent à revêtement irrégulier | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.07.2006 | [2006/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0923953 (SCHNEIDER USA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077]; figure 9 *; | [X]EP0916317 (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0824900 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1,3,11,12 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 11; figures 4-6 *; | [X]EP0689807 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1,11 * column 4, line 37 - line 44; figure 1 * * column 7, line 16 - line 47 *; | [X]US5674276 (ANDERSEN ERIK [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,11 * column 6, line 37 - line 39; figure - *; | [PXA]DE19913978 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,11 * column 2, line 46 - line 55; figure 4 * * column 3, line 19 - line 30 * * column 6, line 34 - line 43 * [A] 3-5,7 |