EP1084674 - Method of visibly distinguishing a first layer of blood vessels from a second one and device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/12] | Method for visualizing of first blood vessel layer from second one and device therefor | ||
[2001/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY Applied Physics Laboratory, 11100 Johns Hopkins Road Laurel, MD 20723-6099 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University Applied Physics Laboratory, 11100 Johns Hopkins Road Laurel, MD 20723-6099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flower, Robert, Walter 11 Dellwood Court Hunt Valley, Maryland 21030 / US | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00250385.2 | 26.09.1994 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084674 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084674 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/12, A61B3/14, A61B6/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Unterscheiden einer ersten Lage von Blutgefä en von einer zweiten | [2001/42] | English: | Method of visibly distinguishing a first layer of blood vessels from a second one and device therefor | [2001/42] | French: | Méthode optique et dispositif pour distinguer une première couche de vaisseaux sanguins d'une seconde couche | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum sichtbar machen einer ersten Blutgefässlage aus einer Zweiten | ||
Former [2001/12] | Method for visualizing of first blood vessel layer from second one and device therefor | ||
Former [2001/12] | Méthode et dispositif pour visualiser une première couche de vaisseaux sanguins à partir d'une seconde | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94931769.7 / EP0801534 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5150292 (HOFFMANN KENNETH R [US], et al) [Y] 8-12*see abstract*; | [Y]WO9306770 (CANDELA LASER CORP [US]) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document * |