Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022061

EP1022061 - Dispensing multiple-component flowable substances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Griffin LL.C
Rocky Ford Road, P.O. Box 1847 Valdosta
Georgia 31603-1847 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Griffin LL.C
Rocky Ford Road, P.O. Box 1847
Valdosta, Georgia 31603-1847 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Beaver, Larry Gene
5285 Golf Drive
Lake Park, Georgia 31636 / US
02 / Hoff, Edwin Frank Jr.
1302 Gornto Road
Valdosta, Georgia 31602 / US
03 / Las, Allan Steven
3108 Northfield Drive
Valdosta, Georgia 31602 / US
04 / Nichenko, Edward Francis
4905 Meadowood Circle
Hahria, Georgia 31632 / US
05 / Pellitteri, Terrie Jo
1956 Lloyd Jackson Road
Valdosta, Georgia 31601 / US
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Pratt, David Martin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Pratt, David Martin , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00300015.505.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateUS1999023614222.01.1999         Original published format: US 236142
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022061
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022061
Date:21.11.2001
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B05B7/24, B05B12/14
[2000/30]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/32]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abgabe von flüssigen Mehrkomponenten-Substanzen[2000/30]
English:Dispensing multiple-component flowable substances[2000/30]
French:Distribution de substances liquides à plusieurs composants[2000/30]
Examination procedure01.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
10.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2339379  (COOK THALIS E) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US5402916  (NOTTINGHAM JOHN R [US], et al) [YD] 1,2 * column 5, line 35 - line 59; figures 1A-1D *
by applicantUS5152461
 US5320288
 US5385270
 US5398846
 US5402916
 US5595345
 US5605578
 US5713519