Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022458

EP1022458 - Fuel system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US
[2002/03]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Dingle, Philip John Gregory
1195 Bear Creek Court
Rochester, Michigan 48306-4603 / US
02 / Greeves, Godfrey
24 Park View
Hatch End, Middlesex HA5 4LN / GB
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2003/10]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2000/30]Pople, Joanne Selina
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street
Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date00300024.705.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateGB1999000047912.01.1999         Original published format: GB 9900479
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022458
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022458
Date:08.08.2001
[2001/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M57/02, F02M43/00
[2001/31]
Former International [2000/30]F02M57/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/18]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffsystem[2000/30]
English:Fuel system[2000/30]
French:Système à combustible[2000/30]
Examination procedure27.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
16.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
08.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5601067  (WIRBELEIT FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 10; figure . *;
 [A]DE4040235  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 5 - line 26; figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]FR542029  (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5163397  (PIEN PAO C [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 34 - column 11, line 14; figure 7 *;
 [A]CH172170  (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *