EP1072295 - Reversibly expandable structures having polygon links [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoberman, Charles 472 Greenwich Street New York, N.Y. 10013 / US | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300029.6 | 06.01.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | US19990360957 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: US 360957 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1072295 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1072295 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/08, A63H33/04 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
E04B1/3211 (EP,US);
A63F9/088 (EP,US);
A63H33/10 (EP,US);
E04B1/3441 (EP,US);
E04B2001/3282 (EP,US);
E04B2001/3294 (EP,US);
Y10S52/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | Umkehrbare entfaltbare Strukturen mit Polygonverbindungen | [2001/05] | English: | Reversibly expandable structures having polygon links | [2001/05] | French: | Structures réversiblement expansibles avec des liaisons en forme de polygones | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | by applicant | US4942700 | US5024031 |