Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020371

EP1020371 - Vacuum airtight container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miyake, Masaharu
2-42, 2-chome Miyamadai Kawanishi-City
Hyogo-prefecture / JP
For all designated states
Miyake, Kazuyo
2-42, 2-chome Miyamadai Kawanishi-City
Hyogo-prefecture / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Miyake, Masaharu
2-42, 2-chome Miyamadai
Kawanishi-City, Hyogo-prefecture / JP
For all designated states
Miyake, Kazuyo
2-42, 2-chome Miyamadai
Kawanishi-City, Hyogo-prefecture / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date00300128.611.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateJP1999000432611.01.1999         Original published format: JP 432699
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020371
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020371
Date:07.03.2001
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020371
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/20
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/48]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftdichter Vakuumbehälter[2000/29]
English:Vacuum airtight container[2000/29]
French:Recipient sous-vide et étanche[2000/29]
Examination procedure03.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
23.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2003Fee for grant paid
24.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB11.01.2005
FR31.01.2005
[2008/45]
Former [2006/13]GB11.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[PAX]US5957317  (LEE SHUN-CHICH [TW]) [PA] 1 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 8; figures 2-8 * [X] 11;
 [A]US5558243  (CHU HUI-YING [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 14; figures 1-5 *
ExaminationUS5406992