Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025801

EP1025801 - Cannulated tissue anchor insertion system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2013
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LINVATEC CORPORATION
11311 Concept Boulevard Largo
Florida 33773-4908 / US
[2012/24]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
Linvatec Corporation
11311 Concept Boulevard
Largo, Florida 33773-4908 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Trott, A. Frank
1989 Lorraine Road
Largo, Florida 33774 / US
02 / Marchand, Sam R.
1170 Robmar Road
Dunedin, Florida 34698 / US
03 / Booth, Anne F.
968 Shoreline Road
Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Gambell, Derek , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[2012/24]
Former [2000/32]Gambell, Derek , et al
D Gambell & Co, Melbury House, 34 Southborough Road
Bickley, Kent BR1 2EB / GB
Application number, filing date00300473.621.01.2000
[2000/32]
Priority number, dateUS1999024305902.02.1999         Original published format: US 243059
[2000/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1025801
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1025801
Date:29.08.2001
[2001/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025801
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/068
[2001/35]
Former International [2000/32]A61B17/04
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/21]
Former [2000/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zum Einführen eines Ankers im Gewebe[2000/32]
English:Cannulated tissue anchor insertion system[2000/32]
French:Systeme d'insertion d'une ancre dans le tissu[2000/32]
Examination procedure26.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/15]
28.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2012Fee for grant paid
02.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.12.2007
Opposition(s)14.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
ES24.09.2012
[2013/22]
Former [2013/11]BE13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
Former [2013/07]BE13.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0982003  (LINVATEC CORP [US]) [E] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5730744  (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US], et al) [X] 1,27 * the whole document * [A] 14,25,29;
 [A]US5344061  (CRAINICH LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1,14,25,27,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5059206  (WINTERS THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1,14,25,27,29 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0838197  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,14,25,27,29 * abstract *;
 [A]US5643319  (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 1,14,25,27,29 * abstract *;
 [A]US5246441  (ROSS RANDALL D [US], et al) [A] 1,14,25,27,29 * abstract *