Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024489

EP1024489 - Eight-to-fifteen modulation using no merging bit and optical disc recording or reading systems based thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD.
3-12 Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama 221-0022 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Victor Company of Japan, Ltd.
3-12 Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama 221-0022 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayami, Atsushi
454-7, Kuden-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama / JP
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00300585.726.01.2000
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateJP1999002331629.01.1999         Original published format: JP 2331699
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1024489
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1024489
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/14, H03M5/14
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/37]
Former [2000/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:8-15 Modulation ohne Vereinigungsbit, und darauf basierte Lese- und Wiedergabesysteme für optischen Platten[2000/31]
English:Eight-to-fifteen modulation using no merging bit and optical disc recording or reading systems based thereon[2000/31]
French:Modulation 8-15 sans bit de liaison et systèmes de lecture et d'enregistrement de disque optique basés sur ce principe[2000/31]
Examination procedure09.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
07.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/44]
14.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1056209  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [E] 1,4,7,9,10,15,17 * the whole document *;
 [XA]EP0718843  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,10,17 * figures 4,11 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 3 * * column 7, line 54 - column 10, line 57 * * column 12, line 34 - column 15, line 31 * * column 16, line 6 - line 50 * [A] 2,7-9,11,13-16;
 [XA]WO9722182  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,10,17 * the whole document * [A] 2,7-9,11,13-16;
 [A]US5790056  (SCHOUHAMER IMMINK KORNELIS A [NL]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *