Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033476

EP1033476 - Heat exchange flow circuit for a turbine rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caruso, Philip M.
62 Dorchester Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
02 / Eldrid, Sacheverel Quentin
7 Conver Drive
Saratago Springs, New York 12866 / US
03 / Ladhani, Azad A.
1366 Rowe Road
Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US
04 / Demania, Alan Richard
13 Brendan Lane
Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US
05 / Palmer, Gene David
87 Gingham Avenue
Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US
06 / Wilson, Ian David
18 Mann Boulevard
Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US
07 / Rathbun, Lisa Shirley
115 Birch Lane
Scotia, New York 12302 / US
08 / Akin, Robert Craig
1054 Park Avenue
Schenectady, New York 12308 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/36]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00300604.627.01.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026127203.03.1999         Original published format: US 261272
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033476
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033476
Date:03.07.2002
[2002/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033476
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/08, F02C7/16, F01D25/10, F01D5/06
[2002/27]
Former International [2000/36]F01D5/08, F02C7/16
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/13]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmeaustausch Kreislauf für einen Turbinenrotor[2000/36]
English:Heat exchange flow circuit for a turbine rotor[2000/36]
French:Circuit d'échange thermique pour un rotor de turbine[2000/36]
Examination procedure03.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/10]
02.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2006Fee for grant paid
31.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Request for further processing for:05.05.2005Request for further processing filed
06.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/35]IT13.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0735238  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,6-8,2-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-10 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 5 * * column 8, line 8 - line 38; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US5537814  (NASTUK JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 1,6-8 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0318026  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-5 * abstract *